MA H825 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 69-11)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to pesticides. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to pesticides
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-31 | House | No further action taken |
2023-09-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-09-07 | House | Accompanied by S487 |
2023-04-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S487 (Similar To) 2023-09-07 - Accompanied H825
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H825 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H825.pdf |