MA H792 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4413

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4413
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a penalty for the transfer or use of glyphosate in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the prohibition of the transfer or use of glyphosate in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4413
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H1332 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1337 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H1488 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4601
H1377 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1308 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H2955 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1555 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3478 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1017 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H359 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H2150 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3917 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4413 (Replaced by) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback