MA H788 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5124
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing municipal notices to the public of hazardous waste sites. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Providing notice to the public of hazardous waste sites
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5124 |
2019-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3873 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H5124 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5124 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H788 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H788.pdf |