MA H758 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2761

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2761
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the regulation and availability of cottage foods. Environment and Natural Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote economic opportunities for cottage food entrepreneurs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-02SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2761
2024-04-11SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 1, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-04-27JointHearing scheduled for 05/08/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-04-18SenateSenate concurred
2023-04-06HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Agriculture
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources

Same As/Similar To

S553 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2761
H2153 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4739
S2761 (Replaced by) 2024-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback