MA H693 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4644

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4644
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative high schools providing and funding college programs. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to college in high schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-11HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4644
2022-02-10SenateSenate concurred
2022-02-03HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday March 1, 2022, pending concurrence
2021-06-07JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S287 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H574 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2280 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4819
S350 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2749
S1661 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S346 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1495 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4819
H4644 (Replaced by) 2022-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback