MA H687 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4650
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the implementation of strategies for reducing solid waste and increasing recycling in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To reduce solid waste, increase recycling and generate municipal cost savings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4650 |
2015-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4650 (Replaced by) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H687 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H687.pdf |