MA H681 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4403

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to early voting. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To extend early voting for all elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4403
2019-10-29JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H684 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H1302 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
H656 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H653 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H661 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S428 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S397 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H692 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S406 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S414 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H2445 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3859 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3860 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S2275 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 86 of the Acts of 2019
H3936 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Hearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2290 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Hearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Hearing scheduled for 01/22/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S2440 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4403 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H639

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback