MA H657 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4403

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to lowering the voting age requirements in local elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to age requirements in local elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4403
2019-06-11JointHearing scheduled for 06/20/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H720 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H722 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
S390 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H662 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H3856 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H4403 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H639

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback