MA H646 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further promote political participation. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting political participation

Sponsors

Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Sen. Michael Moore [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [R]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-11JointHearing scheduled for 06/20/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H2706 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H841 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H1190 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1183 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback