MA H645 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4610

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to higher education capital investments in gateway municipalities or abutting municipalities. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to higher education capital investment in gateway cities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4610
2017-05-30JointHearing scheduled for 06/29/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H637 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H1314 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H12 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4610 (Replaced by) 2018-06-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback