MA H640 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H2225

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
Pending: House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to higher education opportunities for residents of the Commonwealth. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to strengthening and expanding affordable, quality higher education opportunities for residents of the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
2018-03-06HouseAccompanied by H2225
2017-09-22JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Westfield State University
2017-08-30JointHearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Leominster High School
2017-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:30 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-01-17 - Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2018 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H239 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 428
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H2233 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H228 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H12 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H41 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2225 (Replaces) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied H640
S2380 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S2421
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback