MA H631 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-16)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study the financial abuse of elders. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study the financial abuse of elders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H876 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 12:30 PM-04:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
H729 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H2026 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2478 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2324 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
H2741 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2962 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S238 (Similar To) 2019-03-08 - Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H2060 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
S1861 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H190 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2245 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1455 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1470 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1262 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3303 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1223 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2221 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - House concurred
S2223 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback