MA H623 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing spouses to be caregivers in the adult foster care and personal attendant programs. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing spouses as caregivers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-12-10SenateSenate concurred
2019-12-05HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H2542 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2264 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2657 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2608 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4466
S727 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S28 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S1506 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1515 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
S1483 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S879 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1575 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback