MA H614 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S367
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 87-20)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to Improve Alzheimer's’ and dementia care in senior care options programs. Elder Affairs.
Title
To improve Alzheimer's’ and dementia care in senior care options programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-12-16 | House | Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-12-16 | House | Accompanied by S367 |
2019-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S367 (Replaces) 2019-12-16 - Accompanied H614
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H614 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H614.pdf |