MA H613 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S355
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-9)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to intensive case management for clinically complex older adults. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to intensive case management for clinically complex older adults
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-30 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-10-30 | House | Accompanied by S355 |
2019-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S355 (Replaces) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied H613
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H613 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H613.pdf |