MA H605 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Elder Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the licensing and conduct of home care aid agencies. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To improve Massachusetts home care

Sponsors

Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]
Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]
Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. David Biele [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]
Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Monday March 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S381 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback