MA H598 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 96-24)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to services provided through the MassHealth frail elder home and community-based services waiver regarding early-onset Alzheimer's disease. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to early-onset Alzheimer's disease

Sponsors

Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]
Rep. Donald Berthiaume [R]Rep. David Biele [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. Paul Brodeur [D]
Sen. William Brownsberger [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]
Sen. Nick Collins [D]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]
Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Shawn Dooley [R]Rep. William Driscoll [D]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]Sen. Paul Feeney [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]
Sen. Barry Finegold [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Paul Frost [R]Rep. William Galvin [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]
Rep. Susan Gifford [R]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Randy Hunt [R]
Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Hannah Kane [R]
Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Kathleen LaNatra [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Leonard Mirra [R]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]
Rep. James Murphy [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Norman Orrall [R]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]
Rep. Jerald Parisella [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D]
Sen. Michael Rush [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]
Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Sen. Dean Tran [R]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]
Rep. Joseph Wagner [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Donald Wong [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-12-16HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-10-23JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H1128 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1159 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1160 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1136 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H2397 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
S730 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S367 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - Accompanied H614
H1161 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S698 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S50 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S661 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback