MA H574 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4778

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide health benefit plan coverage for hearing aids. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing coverage for hearing aids

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-18HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4778
2017-09-25JointHearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H195 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1628 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S144 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied H195
S1588 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H555 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback