MA H567 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - Proposal rejected -see Senate Roll Call #236 (9 YEAS to 28 NAYS) and -see House Roll Call #197 (34 YEAS to 117 NAYS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-03 - Proposal rejected -see Senate Roll Call #236 (9 YEAS to 28 NAYS) and -see House Roll Call #197 (34 YEAS to 117 NAYS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to creating an independent redistricting commission. Election Laws.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution for an independent redistricting commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | Joint | Proposal rejected -see Senate Roll Call #236 (9 YEAS to 28 NAYS) and -see House Roll Call #197 (34 YEAS to 117 NAYS) |
2016-02-03 | Joint | Read twice |
2015-05-13 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, October 21, 2015 |
2015-05-11 | House | Called for consideration in the joint session |
2015-05-11 | House | Placed on file |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on file |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass |
2015-04-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/28/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H567 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H567.pdf |