MA H5411 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5440
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize Cynthia Falzone to purchase creditable service from the Norfolk County Retirement Board. Public Service.
Title
Authorizing Cynthia Falzone to purchase creditable service from the Norfolk county retirement board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H5440 |
2022-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-12-01 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2022-11-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5440 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5440 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5411 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5411.pdf |