MA H5393 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5434
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Khan of Newton, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Kay Khan that the State Retirement Board be authorized to grant certain creditable service to Robin Blatt, an employee of the Department of Public Health. Public Service.
Title
Public Service Matters
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5434 |
2022-11-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-11-14 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2022-11-10 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5434 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4960 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2425 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1778 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5434 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4960 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5393 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5393.pdf |