MA H5385 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H5354
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 373 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 373 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Montague Center Fire District to continue the employment of fire department members Gary Dion, David Hansen, Mark Fisk, Ann Fisk and Chris Rice
Title
Authorizing the Montague Center Fire District to continue the employment of fire department members Gary Dion, David Hansen, Mark Fisk, Ann Fisk and Chris Rice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 373 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-29 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2022-11-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-11-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-11-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-11-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-11-14 | House | New draft of H5354 |
2022-11-14 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H5354 (Replaces) 2022-11-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5385
H2857 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2857 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5385 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5385.pdf |