MA H5383 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted, on motion of Ms. Garlick of Needham, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 5009) [Local Approval Received]. November 10, 2022.
Title
Authorizing the city of Watertown to adopt an affordable housing linkage fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-08 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-11-10 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-11-10 | House | Substituted for H5009 |
Same As/Similar To
H5009 (Similar To) 2022-11-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5383
H5100 (Similar To) 2022-09-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 220 of the Acts of 2022
H5339 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5100 (Similar To) 2022-09-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 220 of the Acts of 2022
H5339 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5383 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5383.pdf |