MA H5382 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 375 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 375 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to validate the actions taken at the annual town meeting in the town of Milford. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Validating the actions taken at the Milford Annual Town Meeting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 375 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-12-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-12-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-11-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S460 (Similar To) 2022-07-21 - Substituted by a bill, see H5067
S467 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S24 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2021
S2463 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S1356 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S467 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5284
S1334 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S24 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2021
S2463 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S1356 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5382 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5382.pdf |