MA H5377 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Woburn be authorized to extend the time for the issuance of alcoholic beverage licenses in said city. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To extend the time for the issuance of alcoholic beverage licenses in the city of Woburn
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-12-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-12-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-11-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-11-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-11-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H383 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
H2168 (Similar To) 2021-07-14 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H3947
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H383 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
H2168 (Similar To) 2021-07-14 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H3947
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5377 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5377.pdf |