MA H5296 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Conway be authorized to continue the employment of Randell Williams, a member of the police department of said town. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Conway to continue the employment of police officer Randell Williams
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2023-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-12-05 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-10-20 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-10-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-10-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-10-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-09-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H5295 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5296 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5296.pdf |