MA H5294 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Concord be authorized to establish a fee for checkout bags in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the Town of Concord to establish a fee for checkout bags
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-10-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-10-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-09-19 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4091 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4106 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2438 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3719 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
H4106 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2438 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3719 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5294 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5294.pdf |