MA H5292 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the examining and licensing of pipefitters. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Clarify the existing pipefitting exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-10-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-09-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-09-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2022-08-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1833 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1873 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
S1977 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S2455 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1940 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4934
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2845 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1854 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1873 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4562
S1977 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S2455 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1940 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4934
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2845 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1854 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5292 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5292.pdf |