MA H5251 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H5139
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 300 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 300 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the city of Boston to grant five additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises of Bolling Municipal Building and Strand Theater
Title
Authorizing the city of Boston to grant five additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises of Bolling Municipal Building and Strand Theater
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 300 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-12 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-08 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-10-24 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-09-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-09-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-08-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-08-29 | House | New draft of H5139 |
2022-08-29 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H5139 (Replaces) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5251
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5251 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5251.pdf |