MA H5241 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 25 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to abolishing the town of Hardwick Sewer Commission and delegating to the select board control over the Hardwick sewer redevelopment project. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abolishing the town of Hardwick Sewer Commission and delegating to the Select Board control over the Hardwick sewer redevelopment project

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-09-22HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2022-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/16/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2022-08-29SenateSenate concurred
2022-08-25HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H5242 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback