MA H5232 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 371 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 371 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Sabadosa of Northampton and Senator Comerford, a joint petition of Lindsay N. Sabadosa and Joanne M. Comerford (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the Northampton Retirement Board be authorized to grant creditable service to William Dwight. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Directing the Northampton Retirement Board to grant creditable service to William Dwight
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 371 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-09-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-09-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-09-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-08-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5232 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5232.pdf |