MA H5232 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4972

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-07 - Laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the University of Massachusetts to convey a certain parcel of land with buildings thereon in the town of Nantucket to the town of Nantucket Affordable Housing Trust Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the University of Massachusetts to convey a certain parcel of land with buildings thereon in the town of Nantucket to the town of Nantucket Affordable Housing Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-07SenateLaid before the Governor
2021-01-06SenateEnacted
2021-01-06HouseEnacted
2021-01-06SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2021-01-06HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2021-01-05SenatePassed to be engrossed
2021-01-05SenateBills in the Third Reading discharge report accepted
2021-01-05SenateRead third
2021-01-05SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2021-01-04HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2021-01-04HouseRules suspended
2021-01-04HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2021-01-04HouseRules suspended
2021-01-04HouseOrdered to a third reading
2021-01-04HouseNew draft of H4972
2021-01-04HousePending new draft of H4972
2021-01-04HouseReported from the committee on House Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

H4972 (Replaces) 2021-01-04 - New draft substituted, see H5232

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback