MA H5161 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4811
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Ayer select board to acquire a water line easement on land of the department of conservation and recreation
Title
Authorizing the town of Ayer select board to acquire a water line easement on land of the department of conservation and recreation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #258 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-15 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 184 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #258 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2022-08-01 | House | Enacted - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 283 ) |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-08-01 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-31 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-31 | House | New draft of H4811 |
2022-07-31 | House | Pending new draft of H4811 |
2022-07-31 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4811 (Replaces) 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5161
H5087 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5338
H4804 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5087 (Similar To) 2022-10-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H5338
H4804 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5161 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5161.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall258.pdf |