MA H5129 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5102
Note: Legislation replaced by H5130

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-19 - Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
Pending: House Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Section 3 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2020 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects (see House, No. 5102, amended), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message see House, No. 5130). November 10, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Opioid Recovery and Remediation Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-19HouseReferred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
2020-11-19HouseFor message, see H5130, Attachment A
2020-11-10HouseGovernor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment
2020-11-06HouseEnacted as section 3 of the Supplemental Appropriation Bill, see H5102

Same As/Similar To

H5102 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H5129 for section 3
H5130 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Placed on file

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback