MA H512 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Economic Development and Emerging Technologies Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to a grant program for certain small community churches in gateway cities, so-called. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to small churches economic stimulus package in Gateway cities during the COVID-19 pandemic

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

H1361 (Similar To) 2021-07-02 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S350 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2916 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Senate concurred
S2152 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - House concurred
H4037 (Similar To) 2021-07-29 - Senate concurred
H4090 (Similar To) 2021-08-26 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback