MA H5092 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1522
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to civil rights
Title
Relative to civil rights
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on the Judiciary | Rep. Michael Day [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Andres Vargas [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-26 | House | New draft of H1522 |
2022-07-26 | House | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H1522 (Replaces) 2022-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5092
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1069 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1643 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S996 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
H1617 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1730 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1561 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1579 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S1069 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1643 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S996 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2838
H1617 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1730 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1561 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5092 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5092.pdf |