MA H5082 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 347 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 347 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4390). October 29, 2020).
Title
Authorizing the Town of Kingston to establish a Special Fund to process activity produced by Non-Town Net Metering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 347 of the Acts of 2020 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-11-02 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-10-29 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-10-29 | House | Substituted for H4390 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5082 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5082.pdf |