MA H5067 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H4953

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-12-01 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pertaining to liquor licenses in the town of Brookline

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pertaining to liquor licenses in the town of Brookline

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-01SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2020-11-30HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2020-11-02HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2020-11-02HouseRules suspended
2020-11-02HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2020-10-22HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2020-10-22HouseNew draft of H4953
2020-10-22HouseReported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H4953 (Replaces) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5067

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback