MA H5064 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5066
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a minimum unemployment weekly benefit amount during a public health emergency. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to additional unemployment benefits for the neediest recipients currently excluded from the Lost Wages Assistance program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H5066 |
2020-10-20 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/21/2020 from 02:30 PM-04:00 PM in Accepting Written Testimony |
2020-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2020 from 02:30 PM-04:00 PM in Accepting Written Testimony |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-10-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H5066 (Replaced by) 2020-10-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5064 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H5064.pdf |