MA H505 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize certain students majoring in education at colleges or universities to be granted substitute teaching permits and to be paid the same rate as substitute teachers. Education.
Title
Relative to substitute teachers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-08-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H455 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H505 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H505.pdf |