MA H5009 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5383
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-10 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5383
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city known as the town of Watertown be authorized to adopt an affordable housing linkage fee for non-residential development. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Watertown to adopt an affordable housing linkage fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-10 | House | Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5383 |
2022-11-10 | House | Read third |
2022-10-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-10-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-10-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-08-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-08-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/05/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-11 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H5100 (Similar To) 2022-09-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 220 of the Acts of 2022
H5339 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5383 (Replaced by) 2022-12-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2022
H5339 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5383 (Replaced by) 2022-12-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 302 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5009 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5009.pdf |