MA H5008 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to eligibility for voting in local elections in the town of Brookline. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing local voting rights for permanent legal residents residing in Brookline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-25 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday September 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-07-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-11 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S2473 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2530 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2713
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4567 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H4450 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2530 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2713
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4567 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H4450 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5008 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H5008.pdf |