MA H4989 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 4903). September 21, 2020.
Title
Relative to change the name of the Board of Selectmen of the Town of North Andover to Select Board to exhibit gender neutrality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 292 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-09-21 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2020-09-21 | House | Substituted for H4903 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4989 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4989.pdf |