MA H4982 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on November 29 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the retirement benefits of Sean M. Gannon, a fallen police officer in the town of Yarmouth

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the retirement benefits of Sean M. Gannon, a fallen police officer in the town of Yarmouth

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-13HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-12-13HouseRules suspended
2018-12-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-12-13HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-12-07JointHearing scheduled for 12/11/2018 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-2
2018-12-06SenateSenate concurred
2018-11-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H4971 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4933 (Similar To) 2018-11-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback