MA H4973 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an opioid use disorder education, treatment and recovery fund within the Franklin County Sheriff’s Office. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Establishing the Franklin County Sheriff’s opioid use disorder education, treatment and recovery fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-09-08 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2020-09-03 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4973 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4973.pdf |