MA H4964 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the appointment of a tenant member to the board of the Needham Housing Authority in the town of Needham. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for tenant member appointment to the board of the Needham Housing Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-28 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-11-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-11-21 | House | Enacted |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-08-25 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-08-22 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-07-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-07-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2022 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4964 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4964.pdf |