MA H4959 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Cambridge be authorized to offer early voting in municipal elections. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Cambridge to offer early voting in municipal elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-12-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2018 from 03:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-11-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H4926 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2088 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2897 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H385 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2088 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2897 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H385 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4959 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4959.pdf |