MA H4955 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Webster be authorized to exempt certain positions in the police department of said town from the civil service law. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Exempting certain positions of the police department of the town of Webster from the civil service law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-12-18 | House | Enacted |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-10 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-10-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-10-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-10-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-09-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-08-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/31/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4955 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4955.pdf |