MA H4953 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5067

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5067
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Brookline be authorized to reallocate certain licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises in certain target commercial areas in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pertaining to liquor licenses in the town of Brookline

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-22HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H5067
2020-10-05HouseRecommitted to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
2020-10-05HouseRules suspended
2020-10-05HouseOught NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
2020-09-15JointHearing scheduled for 09/18/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2020-08-20SenateSenate concurred
2020-08-17HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H5067 (Replaced by) 2020-10-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback