MA H4936 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2778
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 449 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 449 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the charter of the city of Greenfield
Title
Relative to the charter of the city of Greenfield
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 449 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-01-01 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read third |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-18 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-18 | House | New draft of H2778 and H4483 |
2018-10-18 | House | Reported from the committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
Same As/Similar To
H2778 (Replaces) 2018-10-18 - Consolidated with H4483
H2705 (Similar To) 2017-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2017
H4483 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4936
H4464 (Similar To) 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 286 of the Acts of 2018
H2705 (Similar To) 2017-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2017
H4483 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4936
H4464 (Similar To) 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 286 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4936 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4936.pdf |